TX SB1914 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to annually adjusting for inflation the maximum amount of a motor vehicle excluded in determining eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to annually adjusting for inflation the maximum amount of a motor vehicle excluded in determining eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] |
Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1230 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
HB2641 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Received from the House
HB2641 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Received from the House