TX SB1901 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the secretary of state to order the performance of certain election functions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the secretary of state to order the performance of certain election functions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-01SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1901
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01901I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01901S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01901E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01901H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01901I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01901I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01901S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01901S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01901E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01901H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments

feedback