TX SB19 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited contracts with companies that discriminate against the firearm or ammunition industries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited contracts with companies that discriminate against the firearm or ammunition industries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1023 (Y: 86 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1022 (Y: 65 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1008 (Y: 62 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1023
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1022
2021-05-13HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Goodwin
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#1008
2021-05-12HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Beckley
2021-05-12HouseAmended 1-Capriglione
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 2558
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-19HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-15SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenatePassed
2021-04-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-03-03SenateFiled
2021-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2558 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB19
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00019I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00019S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00019E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00019H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00019F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00019H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00019H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00019H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00019I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00019I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00019H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00019H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00019F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00019F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB19&RcdVtNo=1008&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB19&RcdVtNo=1022&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB19&RcdVtNo=1023&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=88

Bill Comments 750

feedback