TX SB1886 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the manner in which an individual who has elected to defer collection of a tax, abate a suit to collect delinquent tax, or abate a sale to foreclose a tax lien on the individual's residence homestead is listed on the delinquent tax roll of a taxing unit.
Title
Relating to the manner in which an individual who has elected to defer collection of a tax, abate a suit to collect delinquent tax, or abate a sale to foreclose a tax lien on the individual's residence homestead is listed on the delinquent tax roll of a taxing unit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection