TX SB1882 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice regarding voting by physicians at certain entities to authorize the differentiation of physicians based on maintenance of certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice regarding voting by physicians at certain entities to authorize the differentiation of physicians based on maintenance of certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateAmended
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-18SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4215 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback