TX SB1876 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to emergency planning for the continued treatment and safety of end stage renal disease facility patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency planning for the continued treatment and safety of end stage renal disease facility patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1299
2021-05-23HousePassed
2021-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-05-06HouseRead first time
2021-05-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3965 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1876
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01876I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01876S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01876E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01876H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01876F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01876I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01876I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01876S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01876S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01876H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01876H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01876F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-05-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1876&RcdVtNo=1299&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=127

Bill Comments 750

feedback