TX SB1873 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-34)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-34)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a report regarding certain health and safety information prepared by the Texas Education Agency.
Title
Relating to a report regarding certain health and safety information prepared by the Texas Education Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1542 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety