TX SB1854 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to optional group benefits for dental and vision care under the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance Program.
Title
Relating to optional group benefits for dental and vision care under the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2039 |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DENTAL SERVICES
EYECARE & VISION
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
EYECARE & VISION
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers