TX SB1854 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the review of public school district paperwork to limit paperwork requirements.
Title
Relating to requiring the review of public school district paperwork to limit paperwork requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts