TX SB1853 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain workers' compensation reporting requirements.
Title
Relating to certain workers' compensation reporting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1665 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Effective immediately