TX SB1824 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to punishment for the offense of forgery and to a fee imposed on certain defendants who commit the offense.
Title
Relating to punishment for the offense of forgery and to a fee imposed on certain defendants who commit the offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHECKS
Courts
Courts--Justice
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FORGERY
Courts
Courts--Justice
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FORGERY