TX SB1820 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the promotion of off-label uses of certain drugs, biological products, and devices.
Title
Relating to the promotion of off-label uses of certain drugs, biological products, and devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB2185 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB2185 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Health Care Providers
Health--General
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS