TX SB1816 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-28 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-28 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain temporary vehicle permits and tags.
Title
Relating to certain temporary vehicle permits and tags.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - Amended RV#1456 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1456 |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 1-Herrero |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Paddie |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PERMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PERMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration