TX SB1808 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of providers of certain Medicaid services to persons with an intellectual or developmental disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of providers of certain Medicaid services to persons with an intellectual or developmental disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-05-04HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1808
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01808I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01808S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01808E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01808H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01808F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01808I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01808I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01808S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01808S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01808H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01808F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1808&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback