TX SB1806 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the use of multidisciplinary teams appointed by children's advocacy centers in certain child abuse investigations.
Title
Relating to requiring the use of multidisciplinary teams appointed by children's advocacy centers in certain child abuse investigations.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services