TX SB1804 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for at-risk developments.
Title
Relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for at-risk developments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |