TX SB18 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-14 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a limit on local government expenditures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a limit on local government expenditures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-14SenatePostponed
2017-08-11SenatePostponed
2017-07-26SenatePostponed
2017-07-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-26SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Government Reform, Select
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-18SenateFiled
2017-07-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback