TX SB1795 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1019 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB1532 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1532 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1795 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01795I.htm |