TX SB1793 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to complaints filed against certain law enforcement officers, peace officers, detention officers, county jailers, and fire fighters.
Title
Relating to complaints filed against certain law enforcement officers, peace officers, detention officers, county jailers, and fire fighters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Fire Fighters & Police--General
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS