TX SB1792 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a leave pool for school district employees.
Title
Relating to a leave pool for school district employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Labor
Labor--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Labor
Labor--General