TX SB1790 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to distributing or prescribing abortion-inducing drugs; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to distributing or prescribing abortion-inducing drugs; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Abortion
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health Care Providers
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHYSICIANS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health Care Providers
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHYSICIANS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH