TX SB179 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of public school counselors' work time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of public school counselors' work time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1380 (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1380
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-16HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-16HouseRead first time
2021-04-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-13SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenatePassed
2021-04-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-12SenateFiled
2020-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB589 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB179
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00179I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00179S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00179E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00179H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00179F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00179I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00179I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00179S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00179S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00179E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00179H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00179F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB179&RcdVtNo=1380&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback