TX SB1782 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the elimination of certain formula funding and dropped course restrictions for returning adult students at public institutions of higher education and to the tuition rate that may be charged to those students for certain excessive undergraduate hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the elimination of certain formula funding and dropped course restrictions for returning adult students at public institutions of higher education and to the tuition rate that may be charged to those students for certain excessive undergraduate hours.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1273 (Y: 132 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - Amended RV#1264 (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-28SenateRead
2017-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-16HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-16HouseRecord vote
2017-05-16HousePassed
2017-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15HouseRecord vote
2017-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-15HouseAmended
2017-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1782
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01782I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01782S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01782E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01782H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01782F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F1.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1782&RcdVtNo=1264&Ch=H&Dt=05/15/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1782&RcdVtNo=1273&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=90

Bill Comments

feedback