TX SB1781 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of certain educational institutions by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board; providing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of certain educational institutions by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board; providing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Point of order overruled RV#1621 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1577 (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - RV#1576 (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - 1-González RV#1575 (Y: 91 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenatePassed
2017-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateAmended
2017-04-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-12SenateReported favorably as amended
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1781
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01781I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01781S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01781E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01781H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01781F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-25-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1781&RcdVtNo=1575&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1781&RcdVtNo=1576&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1781&RcdVtNo=1577&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1781&RcdVtNo=1621&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=99

Bill Comments

feedback