TX SB1776 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the inclusion of an elective course on the founding principles of the United States in the curriculum for public high school students and the posting of the founding documents of the United States in public school buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the inclusion of an elective course on the founding principles of the United States in the curriculum for public high school students and the posting of the founding documents of the United States in public school buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Amended RV#987 (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-31HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-27SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-27SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#987
2021-05-11HousePassed as amended
2021-05-11HouseAmended 3-M. González
2021-05-11HouseAmended 2-Collier
2021-05-11HouseAmended 1-J. Turner
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-10HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-10HouseAmended 7-Zwiener
2021-05-10HouseAmended 6-Crockett
2021-05-10HouseAmended 5-Slaton
2021-05-10HouseAmended 4-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-10HouseAmended 3-Vasut
2021-05-10HouseAmended 2-Oliverson
2021-05-10HouseAmended 1-K. Bell
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1776
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1776 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1776
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01776I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01776S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01776E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01776H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H26.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H27.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H32.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01776H33.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01776I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01776I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01776H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1776&RcdVtNo=987&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=47

Bill Comments 750

feedback