TX SB177 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to informed consent before provision of certain medical treatments and exemptions from COVID-19 vaccination requirements.
Title
Relating to informed consent before provision of certain medical treatments and exemptions from COVID-19 vaccination requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB81 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COVID-19
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
INFORMED CONSENT
TEXAS COVID-19 VACCINE FREEDOM ACT
COVID-19
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
INFORMED CONSENT
TEXAS COVID-19 VACCINE FREEDOM ACT