TX SB1757 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to securitizing costs associated with electric markets; granting authority to issue bonds.
Title
Relating to securitizing costs associated with electric markets; granting authority to issue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4492 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
HB4492 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
HB4492 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BONDS
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
ELECTRIC SECURITIZATION CORPORATION, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
ELECTRIC SECURITIZATION CORPORATION, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--Electric