TX SB1757 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to a study by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality of methods for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so that they do not enter a wastewater system.
Title
Relating to a study by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality of methods for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so that they do not enter a wastewater system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3753 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Withdrawn from schedule
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Health
Health--General
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Health
Health--General
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS