TX SB1755 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of certain health care provider participation programs in this state.
Title
Relating to the operation of certain health care provider participation programs in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3456 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Effective immediately
HB3456 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Effective immediately
HB3456 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BEXAR COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
EL PASO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
EL PASO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB1755 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01755I.htm |