TX SB1753 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to positive behavioral interventions and supports for students enrolled in public school who receive special education services.
Title
Relating to positive behavioral interventions and supports for students enrolled in public school who receive special education services.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1753 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01753I.htm |