TX SB1750 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirements for employment positions provided through the Texas college work-study program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirements for employment positions provided through the Texas college work-study program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-30 - House - SB 1750Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - House - SB 1750Third Reading House (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective immediately
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01HouseSigned in the House
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-31HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-30SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-30SenateRecord vote
2015-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2015-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-30HouseRecord vote
2015-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2015-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2015-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2015-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2015-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2015-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2015-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2015-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2015-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2015-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2015-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2015-05-25SenateRead
2015-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-22HouseRecord vote
2015-05-22HousePassed
2015-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-21HouseRecord vote
2015-05-21HouseAmended
2015-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-01HouseReferred to Higher Education
2015-05-01HouseRead first time
2015-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-16SenateRecord vote
2015-04-16SenatePassed
2015-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-16SenateRecord vote
2015-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2015-03-24SenateRead first time
2015-03-13SenateFiled
2015-03-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback