TX SB1749 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility and designation of certain gas entities and gas facilities as critical during an energy emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility and designation of certain gas entities and gas facilities as critical during an energy emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3648 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
HB3648 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback