TX SB1742 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to physician and health care provider directories, preauthorization, utilization review, independent review, and peer review for certain health benefit plans and workers' compensation coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to physician and health care provider directories, preauthorization, utilization review, independent review, and peer review for certain health benefit plans and workers' compensation coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2016 (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Amended RV#1466 (Y: 117 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - RV#1465 (Y: 121 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#2016
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2194
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 850
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-22SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-22SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-22HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-22HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-20HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-20HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-20SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-20SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-20SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-20SenateRead
2019-05-20SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1466
2019-05-17HousePassed as amended
2019-05-17HouseAmended 5-G. Bonnen
2019-05-17HouseAmended 4-Sheffield
2019-05-17HouseAmended 3-Zedler
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1465
2019-05-17HouseAmended 2-S. Davis
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-J.E. Johnson
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-05-01HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2630 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1742
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01742I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01742S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01742E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01742H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01742F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-26-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1742&RcdVtNo=1465&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1742&RcdVtNo=1466&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1742&RcdVtNo=2016&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=46

Bill Comments

feedback