TX SB1741 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to pretrial procedures, conditions for community supervision, and criminal punishment for conduct endangering the public safety; creating a criminal offense and increasing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pretrial procedures, conditions for community supervision, and criminal punishment for conduct endangering the public safety; creating a criminal offense and increasing criminal penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-27SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-27SenateRereferred to committee
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1684 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB1684 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback