TX SB1737 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to accrual and use of leave of absence for certain training or duty, including military training or duty, by public employees and officers.
Title
Relating to accrual and use of leave of absence for certain training or duty, including military training or duty, by public employees and officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |