TX SB1732 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that certain water districts make audio and video recordings of open meetings available on the Internet.
Title
Relating to a requirement that certain water districts make audio and video recordings of open meetings available on the Internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2527 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
INTERNET
Open Meetings
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Open Meetings
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility