TX SB173 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation for criminal prosecution and other purposes of certain chemicals commonly referred to as synthetic cannabinoids as controlled substances and controlled substance analogues under the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Relating to the designation for criminal prosecution and other purposes of certain chemicals commonly referred to as synthetic cannabinoids as controlled substances and controlled substance analogues under the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - SB 173Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-11 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |