TX SB1727 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to rules adopted and reporting required under the school district college credit program.
Title
Relating to rules adopted and reporting required under the school district college credit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Education | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS