TX SB172 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the addition of certain substances to Penalty Groups 1-A and 2 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act for criminal prosecution and other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the addition of certain substances to Penalty Groups 1-A and 2 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act for criminal prosecution and other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-11 - House - SB 172Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-05-22 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-11SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-11SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-11HouseRecord vote
2015-05-11HousePassed
2015-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-30HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-04-30HouseRead first time
2015-03-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-03-24SenateReported engrossed
2015-03-24SenateRecord vote
2015-03-24SenatePassed
2015-03-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-24SenateRecord vote
2015-03-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-03-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-03-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-17SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-01-27SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-01-27SenateRead first time
2014-11-10SenateFiled
2014-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback