TX SB1716 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a supplemental special education services and instructional materials program for certain public school students receiving special education services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a supplemental special education services and instructional materials program for certain public school students receiving special education services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Amended RV#1516 (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1516
2021-05-26HousePassed as amended
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-VanDeaver
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-25HouseAmended 3-Buckley
2021-05-25HouseAmended 2-K. Bell
2021-05-25HouseAmended 1-VanDeaver
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably with amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-18HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-18HousePosting rule suspended
2021-05-05HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-05HouseRead first time
2021-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenatePassed
2021-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-29SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1716
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01716I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01716S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01716E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01716H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01716F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01716H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01716H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01716H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01716H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01716I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01716I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01716S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01716S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01716E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01716H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01716H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01716F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01716F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=30
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1716&RcdVtNo=1516&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=68

Bill Comments

feedback