TX SB1679 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of an urban land bank by certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of an urban land bank by certain municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1389 (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Filed without the Governor's signature
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1389
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-23HouseAmended 2-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-23HouseAmended 1-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4065 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1679
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01679I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01679S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01679E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01679H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01679F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01679H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01679H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01679I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01679I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01679S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01679S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01679E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01679H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01679F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01679F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1679&RcdVtNo=1389&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=100
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments 750

feedback