TX SB1675 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures for early voting by mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for early voting by mail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenatePassed
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-22SenateRecord vote
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-22SenateRecord vote
2021-04-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-21SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1675
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01675I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01675S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01675E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01675I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01675I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01675S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01675S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01675E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-22-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-26-F.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments 750

feedback