TX SB1666 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-17)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the conduct of primary elections and certain other election practices; increasing a criminal penalty; creating criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the conduct of primary elections and certain other election practices; increasing a criminal penalty; creating criminal offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Elections
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-22SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback