TX SB1658 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the effect of certain state aid on school districts required to take action to equalize wealth under the school finance system.
Title
Relating to the effect of certain state aid on school districts required to take action to equalize wealth under the school finance system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 1658Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |