TX SB1648 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of benefits under the Medicaid program, including to recipients with complex medical needs.
Title
Relating to the provision of benefits under the Medicaid program, including to recipients with complex medical needs.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1788 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1401 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1788 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1401 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1788 |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1401 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 2-Rose |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Krause |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 5-Raymond |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 4-Noble and Deshotel |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 3-Parker |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 2-Krause |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 1-Krause, Bowers, Parker, Dean, Minjarez, M. González, and Martinez |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4040 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICAID
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICAID