TX SB1639 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-25 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-25 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures for municipal annexations.
Title
Relating to the procedures for municipal annexations.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Konni Burton [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Sen. Donald Huffines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2015-05-25 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |