TX SB1631 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the child safety zone applicable to a person released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Title
Relating to the child safety zone applicable to a person released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD SAFETY ZONES
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety