TX SB1629 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to failure to report assault, neglect, or omission of care in certain group homes; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to failure to report assault, neglect, or omission of care in certain group homes; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Nursing Homes
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Nursing Homes