TX SB1629 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the persons exempted from the required prepayment of the personnel costs incurred by a governmental body in responding to requests from a requestor under the public information law that require large amounts of personnel time.
Title
Relating to the persons exempted from the required prepayment of the personnel costs incurred by a governmental body in responding to requests from a requestor under the public information law that require large amounts of personnel time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-30 | Read | |
2009-05-30 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4147 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs