TX SB1623 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to good cause for revoking the tenure of or otherwise disciplining a faculty member of a public institution of higher education in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to good cause for revoking the tenure of or otherwise disciplining a faculty member of a public institution of higher education in this state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback